Johnson, Suni John (CPSO#: 81670)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam

Education:University of Kerala, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 7106
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2747
Fax: (519) 376-2097
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suni Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Johnson ( CPSO# 81670 )

Business Address:
Suite 7106
1800 - 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2747

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUNI JOHN JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jul 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2005