Johnson-Obaseki, Stephanie Elin (CPSO#: 84845)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: Johnson, Stephanie Elin (used until: 22 Jan 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
S3
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 78596
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephanie Johnson-Obaseki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Johnson-Obaseki ( CPSO# 84845 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
S3
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE ELIN JOHNSON-OBASEKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON-OBASEKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011