Johnston, David George (CPSO#: 22850)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Health Records 100 West 5th St Hamilton, ON L9C 0E3
Instructions: Medical records location as per above.
Date Received: 24 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 20 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 16 Jun 1969 to 15 Jun 1970
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Aug 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018