Johnston, James Douglas (CPSO#: 87936)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Dec 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
KMH Cardiology and
Diagnostic Centres
Suite 108
751 B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N4
Phone: (519) 569-7363
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

437 Norwich Avenue
Woodstock ON  N4S 3W4
Canada
Phone: 519-539-1261
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

Southmount Health Care Centre
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Suite 3G
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 2W2
Canada
Phone: 1-877-564-5227
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Johnston Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Johnston ( CPSO# 87936 )

Business Address:
437 Norwich Avenue
Woodstock ON  N4S 3W4
Phone Number: (877) 564-5227

Business Address:
104 - 206 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 3A9
Phone Number: (877) 564-5227

Business Address:
KMH Cardiology and Diagnostic Centres
Suite 207
751 B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N4
Phone Number: (887) 564-5227

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 19 Dec 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 18 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Jun 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 13 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Dec 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  James  Douglas Johnston may practise medicine independently in cardiology,
            excluding interventional cardiology, only.