Johnston, Karen Elizabeth (CPSO#: 58244)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Nov 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Maple Grove Village
511 Maple Grove Drive,
Suite 61071
Oakville ON  L6J 7P5
Phone: 647-774-9691
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen Johnston Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Johnston ( CPSO# 58244 )

Business Address:
Suite 403
265 Yorkland Boulevard
Toronto ON  M2J 1S5
Phone Number: (416) 229-2399

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN ELIZABETH JOHNSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1988