Johnston, Robert Smith (CPSO#: 73400)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Oct 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
875 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1S 5P1
Phone: 613-725-9965 Ext. 893
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Johnston Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 31 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT SMITH JOHNSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2004