Johnstone, Jennie (CPSO#: 80436)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 May 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 May 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Center
Toronto, ON
M6R 1B5
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000 Ext. 3959
Fax: (416) 530-6519
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael A. McDonald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. McDonald ( CPSO# 80565 )
Dr. J. Johnstone ( CPSO# 80436 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
11th Floor Room 11-PMB-131
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 19 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIE JOHNSTONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSTONE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 26 Jan 2004 to 22 Feb 2004
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 04 Jun 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Feb 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2008