Jolles, Brigitte (CPSO#: 77315)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Lausanne, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2002
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Feb 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 May 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 May 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 May 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002