Jonas, Krista Marie (CPSO#: 66948)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brock University
500 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 3A1
Phone: (905) 688-5550 Ext. x3243
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Song & Dr. Krista Jonas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Song ( CPSO# 67135 )
Dr. K. Jonas ( CPSO# 66948 )

Business Address:
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 732-6111

Business Address:
Brock University
500 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 3A1
Phone Number: (905) 688-5550

Business Address:
Suite E
165 Plymouth Road
Welland ON  L3B 3E1
Phone Number: (905) 734-9434

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTA MARIE JONAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 08 May 1996 to 04 Nov 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1995