Jones, Andrew Edward (CPSO#: 71212)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Room E1 102
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6538
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jones Malik Morrison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2007


Corporation Name: Andrew Jones Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jones ( CPSO# 71212 )

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3197

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6000

Business Address:
1824 Concession Drive
Newbury ON  N0L 1Z0
Phone Number: (519) 693-4441

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8141

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW EDWARD JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002