Jones, Barry Douglas Walter (CPSO#: 58786)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 22566 132nd Avenue, Maple Ridge, BC VR4 2R2
Date Received: 01 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2015