Jones, Gerald Edward (CPSO#: 16135)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2000

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Date of Death: 25-Jul-2012

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1957
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 31 May 1988
Summary:

 In May 1988, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Jones guilty of professional misconduct, as defined 
 in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard 
 of practice of the profession.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Jones be reprimanded, 
 with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded in the Register.  The Committee also ruled that Dr. 
 Jones' licence to practice be suspended for three months, with the suspension itself to be 
 suspended provided that the Doctor cooperate in an investigation of his practice of the kind 
 provided for in s. 64 of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 30 May 1988