Jones, Graham Longden (CPSO#: 66755)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Dec 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3U7 M U M C
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 905 521 2100 Ext. 76401
Fax: 905 521 4971
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Longden Jones Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Jones ( CPSO# 66755 )

Business Address:
3U7
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
ICU
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
B1-106E
300 Wellington Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 0A4
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 26 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRAHAM LONGDEN JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jul 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1997
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1999