Jones, Gwynne (CPSO#: 27983)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 May 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 May 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of London, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 406-1106
Fax: (613) 737-8890
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

TOH all campuses.
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8222 Ext. 9830
Fax: (613) 737-8890
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gwynne Jones Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 5 2008


Corporation Name: Gwynne Jones Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Jones ( CPSO# 27983 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 406-1106

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GWYNNE JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: None Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1984