Jones, Janelle Elizabeth (CPSO#: 92632)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Apr 2010 to 02 May 2010
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 2014