Jones, Jennifer Kathleen (CPSO#: 88611)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 310
15 Mountain Avenue South
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 2V6
Phone: (905) 664-3730
Fax: (905) 664-9921
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer K. Jones Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jones ( CPSO# 88611 )

Business Address:
Suite 310
15 Mountain Avenue South
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 2V6
Phone Number: (905) 664-3730

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER KATHLEEN JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010