Jones, Mark Bradley (CPSO#: 77938)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
353 St Paul Avenue
2nd Floor
Brantford ON  N3R 4N3
Phone: (519) 512-0058
Fax: (519) 512-0611
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Canada
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Jones Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jones ( CPSO# 77938 )

Business Address:
353 St. Paul Avenue
2nd Floor
Brantford ON  N3R 4N3
Phone Number: (519) 512-0058

Business Address:
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 752-7871

Business Address:
690 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3W7
Phone Number: (905) 842-3666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 02 Oct 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK BRADLEY JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2006