Jones, Michelle-Lee (CPSO#: 96768)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michelle-Lee Jones Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 29 Jul 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2011 to 25 Sep 2011
Elective Trainee - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2012 to 31 Jul 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2017