Jones, Sarah Ann (CPSO#: 68910)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Pediatric Surgery
Room B1-131
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 2V3
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 71553
Fax: (519) 685-8019
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jones Arellano Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Arellano ( CPSO# 54044 )
Dr. S. Jones ( CPSO# 68910 )

Business Address:
Victoria Hospital
Department of Surgery
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6G 2V5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 21 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 03 Oct 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH ANN JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2004