Joraied, Mohammed Ali Ahmed (CPSO#: 72899)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 03 Sep 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Sep 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 08 Jul 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 09 Jul 1999 to 03 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Sep 1999