Josefchak, Robert George (CPSO#: 50864)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Oct 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
180 Vine Street
Suite 306
Aviva Medical Specialists Clinic
Niagara Health Center
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3
Phone: 8552100757 Ext. 510
Fax: 8552100758
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. G. Josefchak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Josefchak ( CPSO# 50864 )

Business Address:
Suite 306
180 Vine Street South
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3
Phone Number: (855) 210-0757

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre St Catharines
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT GEORGE JOSEFCHAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSEFCHAK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1986