Joseph, Jay Ashvin (CPSO#: 93605)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Sep 2016

Expiry Date:  28 Sep 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Sep 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Whitby
300 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5T2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.A. Joseph Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Joseph ( CPSO# 93605 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Whitby
300 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5T2
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health,Whitby Site Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 29 Sep 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2016
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 28 Sep 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Sep 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Jay  Ashvin Joseph may practise Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
                  with Lakeridge Health, in Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by
                  a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate  of  registration  automatically expires three years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Joseph's  eligibility  to take the Royal
                  College  of  Physicians  and  Surgeons  of  Canada  examination  expires,
                  whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding  Dr.
                        Joseph's  knowledge,  skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to  the  College  by  the  due  date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Joseph's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on September 29, 2016, and will  expire  on or
                  before September 28, 2019, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.