Josephson, Deborah Gayle (CPSO#: 62110)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Area Family Health Team
P.O. Box 98
6 Goshen Street South
Zurich ON  N0M 2T0
Phone: (519) 236-4314
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deborah Josephson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Josephson ( CPSO# 62110 )

Business Address:
6 Goshen Street South
Zurich ON  N0M 2T0
Phone Number: (519) 236-4314

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH GAYLE JOSEPHSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSEPHSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1991
Suspension of registration imposed: Fitness to Practise Committee Effective: 26 Nov 1996
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 12 Jun 2000
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2003

Previous Hearings

Committee: Fitness To Practise
Decision Date: 26 Nov 1996
Summary:

 On November 26, 1996, the Fitness to Practise Committee found Dr. Josephson to be an incapacitated 
 member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario as defined in ss.1(1) of the Health 
 Professions Procedural Code.  Pursuant to ss.69(1) of the Code, the Committee ordered that Dr. 
 Josephson(s certificate of registration in the Province of Ontario be suspended for an indefinite 
 period of time and be removed only by subsequent order of the Fitness to Practise Committee.

On 
 June 12, 2000, the Committee granted Dr. Josephson(s application to remove the suspension 
 effective immediately.  

On August 7, 2003, the Fitness to Practise vacated all terms of its 
 order of June 12, 2000.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 26 Nov 1996