Joshi, Anand Pradip (CPSO#: 88612)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 03 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 09 Jun 2008 to 29 Jun 2008
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2009 to 21 Jun 2009
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 22 Jun 2009 to 12 Jul 2009
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 04 Sep 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014