Joshi, Harshad Pranshanker (CPSO#: 53781)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Apr 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Swahili

Education:University of Nairobi, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Medical Clinic
1608 Tecumseh Road West
Windsor ON  N9B 1T8
Phone: (519) 258-4400
Fax: (519) 973-3914
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Medical Clinic
6720 Hawthorne
Windsor ON  N8T 1J9
Canada
Phone: (519) 944-2295
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Harshad Joshi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Joshi ( CPSO# 53781 )

Business Address:
1608 Tecumseh Road West
Windsor ON  N9B 1T8
Phone Number: (519) 258-4400

Business Address:
6720 Hawthorne Drive
Windsor ON  N8T 1J9
Phone Number: (519) 944-2295


Corporation Name: Chopra, Joshi, Karnik, & Lamont, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 15 2005


Corporation Name: Chopra, Joshi, Karnik & Lamont Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 26 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chopra ( CPSO# 31096 )
Dr. V. Karnik ( CPSO# 60518 )
Dr. H. Joshi ( CPSO# 53781 )
Dr. J. Lamont ( CPSO# 31730 )

Business Address:
Windsor Medical Clinic
1608 Tecumseh Road West
Windsor ON  N9B 1T8
Phone Number: (519) 258-4400

Business Address:
6720 Hawthorne Avenue
Windsor ON  N8T 1J9
Phone Number: (519) 944-2295

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARSHAD PRANSHANKER JOSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1987