Joshi, Mital (CPSO#: 81171)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
600 University Avenue Room 19-104
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5270
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mital Joshi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Joshi ( CPSO# 81171 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Room 19-104
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5270

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MITAL JOSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009