Joshi, Sapna (CPSO#: 93622)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: Jha, Sapna (used until: 15 Oct 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1123A, Davis Building
3359 Mississauga Road North
Mississauga, ON
L5L 1C6
Oakville ON  L6J 1J5
Phone: 905-828-5255
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rivlin Medical Group
601-89 Queensway W
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Canada
Phone: (905) 281-9898
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sapna Joshi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Joshi ( CPSO# 93622 )

Business Address:
3359 Mississauga Road North
Room 1123A, Davis Building
Mississauga ON  L5L 1C6
Phone Number: (905) 828-5255

Business Address:
Rivlin Medical Group
601 - 89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 281-9898

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAPNA JOSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012