Joshi, Vinay Hanamesh (CPSO#: 82144)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Shivaji University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 03 Jan 2005 to 21 Mar 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 22 Mar 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007