Joshi, Virat (CPSO#: 79972)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue,
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

TORONTO POLY CLINIC
5460 YONGE STREET, UNIT 204
Toronto ON  M2N 6K7
Canada
Phone: (416) 250-7171
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

298 JOHN STREET, UNIT 3
Thornhill ON  L3T 5W4
Canada
Phone: 905-482-8648
Fax: 905-482-8647
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

B2 - 45 WYNDHAM STREET NORTH
Guelph ON  N1H 4E4
Canada
Phone: 519-822-3102
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Virat Joshi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Joshi ( CPSO# 79972 )

Business Address:
298 John Street
Unit 3
Thornhill ON  L3T 5W4
Phone Number: (905) 482-8648

Business Address:
5460 Yonge Street
Unit 204
Toronto ON  M2N 6K7
Phone Number: (416) 250-7171

Business Address:
45 Wyndham Street North
Suite B2
Guelph ON  N1H 4E4
Phone Number: (519) 822-3102

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIRAT JOSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2003

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence

On July 7, 2015, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Toronto, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Virat Joshi in respect of an incident that took place in February 2006.