Joshua, Anthony Michael (CPSO#: 81724)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Oct 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of New South Wales, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Department of Medical Oncology
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 2520
Fax: (416) 946-6546
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joshua and Dr. Berger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Joshua ( CPSO# 81724 )
Dr. E. Berger ( CPSO# 81122 )

Business Address:
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Medical Oncology
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
East York ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective: 01 Oct 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 21 Jul 2004 to 01 Oct 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 02 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 18 Sep 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr. Anthony Michael Joshua may practise medicine independently in medical
                  oncology, only.