Jougheh Doust, Soghra (CPSO#: 88921)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Oct 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Islamic Azad University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Corporation
Genetics Program
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 433 2733
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Genetics Program
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
Phone: (705) 876-5185
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Jougheh Doust Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jougheh Doust ( CPSO# 88921 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Corporation
Genetics Program
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 433-2733

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Genetics Program
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5185

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 03 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOGHRA JOUGHEH DOUST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOUGHEH DOUST is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 16 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 10 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 11 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 10 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Oct 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2017