Joughin, Karen Elise (CPSO#: 61857)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Feb 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Feb 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Vancouver General Hospital
Vancouver BC  V5Z 2M9
Phone: 604-875-4472

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
Australia
British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN ELISE JOUGHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOUGHIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2008