Jovanovic, Radmila (CPSO#: 80459)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Aug 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English, Serbian

Education:University of Belgrade, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
CHEO Diabetes Team
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3090
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University of Ottawa Health Service
Department of Paediatrics
100 Marie Curie
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Canada
Phone: (613) 564-3950 Ext. 450
Fax: 613 564-6627
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 17 Aug 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2004 to 27 Feb 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 28 Feb 2004 to 31 Jan 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
International Specialist Physician - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 May 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 31 May 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 May 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Radmila Jovanovic may practise medicine independently in Paediatrics, only.