Jowett, Jonathan Elliott (CPSO#: 71349)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Emergency Physician's Office
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46368
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

711 Concession Street
Juravinksi Hospital
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46368
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Main Street West Urgent Care
690 Main St West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A4
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 72000
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

ST Joseph's General Hospital
Elliiot lake
70 Spine Road
P5A1X2
Elliot Lake ON  P5A1X2
Canada
Phone: (705) 848-7182
Fax: (705) 848-6239
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Sensenbrenner Hospital
101 Progress Cr
Kapuskasing
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 3H5
Canada
Phone: 7057376111
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

QHC North Hastings Hospital
1-H Manor Lane
Bancroft
Bancroft ON  K0L 1K0
Canada
Phone: (613) 332-2825
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J.E. Jowett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jowett ( CPSO# 71349 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
Emergency Department
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
Emergency Department
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
101 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 3H5
Phone Number: (705) 337-4033

Business Address:
70 Spine Road
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 1X2

Business Address:
Main West Urgent Care
690 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
North Shore Health Network Blind River
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Nov 2000 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN ELLIOTT JOWETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOWETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Nov 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2000