Joy, Tisha Rosalin (CPSO#: 76049)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
B5 107
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6296
Fax: (519) 646-6372
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tisha R. Joy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Joy ( CPSO# 76049 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care Centre
Room B5-107
268 Grosvenor Street
P O Box 5777 Stn B
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6296

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 13 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TISHA ROSALIN JOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2005