Joyce, Susan Mary (CPSO#: 76556)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
343 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3H 1T1
Phone: (416) 785-8412
Fax: (416) 785-8324
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

692 Euclid Avenue
Toronto ON  M6G 2T9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kingdom Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kingdom ( CPSO# 72096 )
Dr. S. Joyce ( CPSO# 76556 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Obstetrics/Gynecology
700 University Avenue
Suite 3-904
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 586-8764

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN MARY JOYCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOYCE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 May 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2002 to 28 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2002