Juergens, Rosalyn Anne (CPSO#: 94794)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 Jan 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Georgetown University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHSC Juravinski Cancer Centre
Department of Medical Oncology
3rd Floor
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495 Ext. 63123
Fax: (905) 575-6326
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Maryland

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective: 26 Jan 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jan 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 06 Feb 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.  Rosalyn Anne Juergens may practise medicine independently in medical
                  oncology, only.