Jura, Janice Marie (CPSO#: 77253)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:NORTHEASTERN OHIO UNIVERSITIES, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2002
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jan 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Dec 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Sep 2011