Jwely, Ahmed Milad (CPSO#: 83239)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 28 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 02 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Jun 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
PEAP - Resident - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2005 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 04 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2015