Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: January 25, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Charges
Kulwant Singh Gill was charged with the following offence:
1. Indecent assault on a named person between the March 1, 1982 and September 30, 1983, contrary to former section 149 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date of Charge: November 16, 2021
Place of Charge: Toronto, Ontario
Toronto Police Services
Source:
Other
Active Date: January 25, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Bail Conditions
On November 15, 2021, the following Conditions of Release (Bail Conditions) were imposed on Kulwant Singh Gill:
1. Gill must notify specified police officer of any change to his address, occupation and employment.
2. Gill must not communicate, directly or indirectly, with named person.
3. Gill must not go within 200 meters of anyplace named person lives, works or happens to be.