First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jun 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Oct 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Apr 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 May 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Oct 2023 |