First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 May 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Mar 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Mar 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Apr 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Mar 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Mar 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 2024 |