Kabir, Atif (CPSO#: 72680)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Dec 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Dec 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Athlete's Care
1595 Merivale Road, Unit 1A-2
Ottawa ON  K2G 3J4
Phone: (613) 688 3184
Fax: (613) 224 6847
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1596 Bank Street, Lower level
Ottawa ON  K1H 7Z5
Canada
Phone: (613) 688 3184
Fax: (613) 224 6847
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

308 Palladium Drive Suite 200
Ottawa ON  K2V 1A1
Canada
Phone: (613) 599 8132
Fax: (613) 599 6139
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amjad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kabir ( CPSO# 72680 )
Dr. A. Amjad ( CPSO# 72208 )

Business Address:
2150 Robertson Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 9S1
Phone Number: (613) 482-0118

Business Address:
1596 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 7Z5
Phone Number: (613) 688-3184

Business Address:
1595 Merivale Road
Suite 1A-2
Ottawa ON  K2G 3K2
Phone Number: (613) 482-0118

Business Address:
308 Palladium Drive
Suite 200
Kanata ON  K2V 1A1
Phone Number: (613) 599-8132

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ATIF KABIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KABIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 24 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 15 Nov 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 16 Nov 1999 to 13 Nov 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Nov 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2000