Kablan, Ahsan Mohamed Hussein (CPSO#: 78620)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Al-Arab Medical University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 09 Feb 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 10 Feb 2004 to 09 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 10 Feb 2005 to 31 May 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2005