Kabra, Nandkishor Shrikishanji (CPSO#: 77297)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Marathwada University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jul 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Sep 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2004