Kadar, Paul Lewis (CPSO#: 80455)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Feb 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Danforth Pediatrics
235 Danforth Avenue
Suite 100
Toronto
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone: 416-466-9629
Fax: 416-466-1311
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The SCAN Program
Room 6427
555 University Avenue
Toronto
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: 416-813-6275
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL LEWIS KADAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KADAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 10 Feb 2004 to 09 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 10 Feb 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2005