Kadhim, Ahmad (CPSO#: 96305)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Ottawa ON  K2B8H4
Phone: 315-713-6740
Fax: 866-725-4762
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois
USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 29 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 29 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHMAD KADHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KADHIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2017