Kadic-Mucevic, Edina (CPSO#: 86040)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 May 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 May 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bosnian, Croatian, English, Serbian

Education:ST CYRIL AND METHODIUS UNIVERSITY, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Winston Park Family Physicians
Suite 104
2315 Bristol Circle
Oakville ON  L6M 6P8
Phone: (905) 829-2826
Fax: (905) 829-2846
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

6981 Millcreek Drive - Unit 2
Mississauga ON  L5N 6B8
Canada
Phone: (289) 724-7246
Fax: (289) 914-2273
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

701 Main Street West - Unit 100
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A2
Canada
Phone: (289) 768-7246
Fax: (289) 779-2273
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edina Kadic-Mucevic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kadic-Mucevic ( CPSO# 86040 )

Business Address:
Winston Park Family Physicians
Suite 104
2315 Bristol Circle
Oakville ON  L6M 6P8
Phone Number: (905) 829-2826

Business Address:
Suite 2
6981 Millcreek Drive
Mississauga ON  L5N 6B8
Phone Number: (289) 724-7246

Business Address:
Suite 100
701 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A2
Phone Number: (289) 768-7246

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDINA KADIC-MUCEVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KADIC-MUCEVIC is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 2008