Kadri, Albert (CPSO#: 68236)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 1998

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2480 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 1L4
Phone: (519) 946-0103
Fax: (519) 977-6690
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Kadri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kadri ( CPSO# 68236 )

Business Address:
2480 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 1L4
Phone Number: (519) 946-0103

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  June 1, 2018
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On June 1, 2018, Windsor Regional Hospital notified the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, pursuant to s.33 of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Albert Kadri’s privileges were suspended, effective June 1, 2018.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 09 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALBERT KADRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KADRI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1998