Kaduri, Pamela Allen (CPSO#: 92168)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 May 2018

Expiry Date:  28 May 2025

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 May 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dar Es Salaam, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto
8th Floor
250 College St
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 979-6948
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Oct 2009 to 17 Dec 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 18 Dec 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 May 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 28 May 2025

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 29 May 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Pamela Allen Kaduri may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Psychiatry,   Division   of  Adult  Psychiatry  &  Health  Systems,
                        University  of Toronto, in  which  Dr.  Kaduri  holds  an  academic
                        appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of  registration  automatically  expires seven years from
                  the  date  of issuance or when Dr. Kaduri no longer  holds  the  academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Kaduri's clinical
                        performance, knowledge,  skill,  judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee does not receive an  annual  report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the  Committee makes a decision about Dr. Kaduri's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  May  29,  2018.   In  accordance  with
                  paragraphs  2  and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on May 28, 2025.